Financial history FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS

Charity number: 1063483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.10k £5.19k £4.72k £1.81k £2.57k
Total expenditure £1.57k £12.28k £9.33k £97 £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A