THE TOPAZ CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1062593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.14k £3.39k £3.22k £3.27k £3.05k
Total expenditure £157 £170 £161 £163 £153
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A