WAR MEMORIALS TRUST

Charity number: 1062255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.19m £1.62m £1.19m £438.45k £336.67k
Total expenditure £1.26m £1.65m £1.18m £338.77k £309.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £908.26k £0 £614.00k £186.00k £94.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £267.91k £384.89k £478.23k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £908.26k £1.22m £715.30k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £14.12k £11.48k £1.41k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £58.72k £93.10k £21.17k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.20m £1.58m £1.13m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.25k £68.48k £52.89k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £14.87k £0 £15.85k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £679.54k £1.08m £670.59k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A