Trustees THEATR BARA CAWS
Charity number: 1062896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Gregory | Chair | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Haydn Wyn Jones | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ifan Pleming | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Evans-Jones | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mared Llywelyn Williams | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mair Eluned Rowlands | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alun Ffred Jones | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Gwenno Angharad Evans | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|||||
GERWYN WILIAMS | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mari Emlyn | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|||||
SION WYN BLAKE | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.