THE KINMEL BAY AND TOWYN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1067087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £0 £1.33k £0 £691 £1.11k
Total expenditure £1.72k £589 £126 £459 £296
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A