Financial history THE BOURNEMOUTH BRANCH OF THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1066750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £3.75k £3.65k £2.96k £126 £1.35k
Total expenditure £4.11k £3.97k £3.07k £87 £1.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A