Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S CHURCH - (CHERISH)

Charity number: 1062598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.73k £3.43k £3.65k £3.29k £3.29k
Total expenditure £10.96k £1.22k £11.20k £1.22k £1.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A