Financial history THE DYSTONIA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1062595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £461.64k £294.69k £221.74k £421.98k £293.05k
Total expenditure £408.06k £427.59k £272.45k £310.10k £262.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A