ZEALS YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 1064296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.72k £34.38k £25.22k £17.40k £14.75k
Total expenditure £22.63k £31.04k £21.20k £23.52k £21.72k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A