ADFAM NATIONAL

Charity number: 1067428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £829.06k £746.50k £573.68k £579.60k £718.57k
Total expenditure £728.58k £688.56k £588.85k £664.37k £663.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £21.00k N/A N/A £21.00k
Income from government grants £142.88k £81.12k £64.40k £80.52k £154.53k
Income - Donations and legacies £37.21k £24.43k £12.39k £23.77k £16.57k
Income - Other trading activities £17.55k £50.81k £26.71k £17.76k £26.24k
Income - Charitable activities £722.27k £671.09k £534.50k £537.87k £675.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £227 £173 £85 £201 £421
Income - Other £51.80k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £702.23k £653.06k £578.78k £650.42k £644.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds £26.35k £35.51k £10.07k £11.07k £18.61k
Expenditure - Governance £6.33k £1.22k £5.79k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.88k £607