Trustees COMMUNITY FOREST TRUST
Charity number: 1072706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON BALL | Chair | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Morgan | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Thomson-Smith | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Beaven | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BURT | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA MERTON | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROF ALAN SIMSON | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID SHAW | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.