Trustees SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF CARDIFF
Charity number: 1063340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Pearce | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jon Whitehead | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Junior Seri | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Abbas | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Hainsworth | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Seri | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hainsworth | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Cathryn Hainsworth | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thenna Abbas | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.