BISHOP'S STORTFORD AND DISTRICT FOOTHPATHS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1068733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £470 £666 £465 £495 £663
Total expenditure £300 £517 £424 £498 £484
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A