Financial history CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (OUTREACH)

Charity number: 1063904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £435.47k £391.29k £370.23k £387.41k £364.83k
Total expenditure £420.24k £384.37k £366.94k £356.32k £261.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £120.25k