Trustees FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE SURGERY
Charity number: 1064542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDSEY BUTTERFIELD | Chair | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
HILARY CHRISTINE STONER | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA FRY | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUE PICKERING | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHIL SKITT | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANNE SKITT BED | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ERIC WILLIAM BRIDGER | Trustee | 19 May 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.