Governing document NEIGHBOURLY CARE LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/10/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/09/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL PEOPLE IN NEED INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE DISABLED OR IN NEED IN ANY MANNER, WHICH IS NOW, OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN WEST LONDON AND MIDDLESEX.
Area of benefit
WEST LONDON AND MIDDLESEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.