Trustees OLDHAM, HENSHAW AND CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 1064939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Smith | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas Henry Davis | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Samuel John Austin | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
VEN DAVID JOHN SHARPLES | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Edward Moores | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|||||
DIANE WRIGLEY | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev NICHOLAS JOHN ANDREWES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MILLICENT FEBER | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev DAVID ROY PENNY | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.