THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S SIBTON

Charity number: 1063822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £7.40k £3.98k £3.46k £8.05k £11.70k
Total expenditure £6.48k £3.62k £2.64k £12.01k £11.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A