Trustees THE WORKINGTON AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1065045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH TURNBULL | Chair | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Louise Harkness | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Francesca Hawley-McGee | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norma Nicholson | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lewis McMinn | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kris White | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edward McGee | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Natasha McKenzie | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNA WALKER | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HAWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHYLLIS MC GEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN BRAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.