Trustees CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM MOVEMENT CHURCH, MOUNT HOREB
Charity number: 1063958
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Babajide Akinlade | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olufunke Aduloju | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Yemisi Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Special Apostle Olapade Adewumi Ola | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pastor/Prophet Emmanuel Oluwasegun Kofoworade Ademoroti | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Special Mother Elizabeth Adefoluke Adenike Ayanda Sp Mother | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
LADY EVANGELIST ESTHER AYOBAMI ADESANYA | Trustee | 05 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
SPECIAL APOSTLE ADEMOLA ANIMASHAUN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.