Financial history ST ANNE'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1063938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.35k £18.50k £18.24k £18.43k £18.27k
Total expenditure £26.02k £41.32k £21.72k £29.70k £35.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A