Trustees DRINGHOUSES (P.C.) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1064151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN BENNETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chris Rundle | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bell | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Lucas | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew White | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rundle | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Selby | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jayne Silke | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Paul Hewitt | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Elliott | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justin Moss | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tina Marie Brill | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Moor | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Beverley Wilson | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Stewart Thorne | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Harvey | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HEWITT | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.