Trustees BACKUP NORTH WEST
Charity number: 1064698
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen Howard Sharples | Chair | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Turton McBride | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Justin Pritchard | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Turnbull | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mair | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Hounslea | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Morgan | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bell | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Maggie Bruce | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Wyatt | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
LISA TULIP | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAURA JACKSON | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.