THE FRIENDS OF ST THOMAS CHURCH NORTHLEW

Charity number: 1070123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £930 £1.04k £1.14k £1.34k £448
Total expenditure £9.28k £330 £420 £3.74k £531
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A