Governing document LIVE INCLUSIVE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 NOV 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 SEP 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JUL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE WHO ARE DISABLED
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.