Trustees YMCA TRINITY GROUP
Charity number: 1069810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Mallinson | Chair | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mills | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martha Felton | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Loveday | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Marlini Finney | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Ann Radmore | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lianne Pemberton | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Simpson | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wilkinson | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andy Lucas | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTONIA KAREN MACLEAN | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.