Trustees CARBROOKE VILLAGE MILLENNIUM GREEN
Charity number: 1064772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY DARBY | Chair | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Defew | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hurst | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Talbot | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan DeFew | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Carlin | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edit Davies | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DURGAN | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.