Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, BENTLEY

Charity number: 1064879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.64k £2.41k £2.38k £1.93k £2.25k
Total expenditure £1.37k £2.50k £1.21k £2.65k £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A