Governing document MITCHELL MINISTRIES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO CONTINUE THE EXISTING AND GROWING WORK OF THE MINISTRY IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IN SUCH OTHER PLACE OR PLACES AS SHALL BE DECIDED UPON BY (A) PROCLAIMING AND FURTHERING THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE UNCOMPROMISED WORD OF GOD ( THE GOSPEL)CONSISTENTLY WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ( THE DOCTRINES)SET FORTH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO AND(B) FACILITATING THE RECONCILIATION MINISTRY OF 2. COR 5.12-17 BETWEEN NATIONAL, RELATIONAL, SOCIOCULTURAL, GENERATIONAL, DISPOSITIONAL GENDER AND DENOMINATIONAL DIVIDES.(II ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND SOCIAL COHESION.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.