Trustees HEALTH FOR ALL (LEEDS) LTD
Charity number: 1068643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR RAJGOPALAN MENON | Chair | 27 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Jones | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin David Dean | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Sword-Williams | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY FRANCIS MCSHARRY | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Ambia Khatun | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Dawkins | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Eric Snell | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Dickinson | Trustee | 12 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Truswell | Trustee | 12 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.