Trustees LITTLE SOMERFORD PARISH HALL
Charity number: 1068998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR MIKE JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Elizabeth Francis | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Tilley | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS L GLYNNE JONES | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nuttall | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS R NUTTALL | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|||||
MRS D BEVERLEY | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.