Financial history THE FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN MICROBIOLOGICAL SOCIETIES

Charity number: 1072117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.44m £2.64m £2.58m £2.73m £2.78m
Total expenditure £1.19m £1.27m £1.35m £1.43m £1.00m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £34.89k £36.62k £34.27k £35.76k £34.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.24m £2.35m £2.32m £2.47m £2.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £163.29k £256.17k £228.71k £225.57k £268.26k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.24m £1.28m £1.39m £951.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.35k £34.85k £76.05k £39.22k £51.38k
Expenditure - Governance £42.32k £70.23k £53.29k £58.03k £33.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £215.83k £126.45k £148.65k £218.24k £55.33k
Expenditure - Investment management £33.35k £34.85k £76.05k £39.22k £51.38k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0