Accounts and annual returns OXFORD ISLAMIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1068787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 March 2019 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 December 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required