Governing document NORFOLK COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 10 MAY 2005 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 JULY 2005 AND 26 APRIL 2006 AND 30 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
1. TO IDENTIFY PROBLEMS OF ACCESS BY NEEDY PEOPLE TO LEGAL SERVICES 2. ESTABLISH AN INDEPENDENT LAW CENTRE (AS CONSTITUTED FROM TIME TO TIME) WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO RELIEVE CHARITABLE NEED, IN PARTICULAR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, BY THE PROVISION OF A LEGAL AID SERVICE TO THOSE IN NEED 3. PROVIDE ADVICE ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO NEEDY PERSONS RESIDENT OR WORKING IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT'). 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE LAW ITS PRACTICE AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE HAVING REGARD ESPECIALLY TO THOSE AREAS OF LAW WHICH ARE OF PARTICULAR CONCERN TO POOR PEOPLE OR WHICH ARE DIRECTED TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS OR SICKNESS. 5. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.