Trustees OAKWOOD COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1067670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Jane Astovasadourian | Chair | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gabriella Harwood | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Glass | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristina McMichael | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Gardam | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adele Mayo | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Ann Gilks | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Munro | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tiffany Ann Woodford | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Penelope Smith | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Symes | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.