Governing document TOR HOMES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29TH APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4TH NOVEMBER 1998 AND FURTHER AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 FEBRUARY 1999 AND ON 30 MARCH 1999 AND ON 18TH SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, AND CHRONICALLY SICK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE HOUSING. (2) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR OTHER FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED AND CHRONICALLY SICK WHO ARE TENANTS OF THE CHARITY (OR DEPENDENTS OF SUCH TENANTS LIVING WITH SUCH TENANTS) AND WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN SOUTH HAMS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.