Financial history CHALKE VALLEY LINK SCHEME

Charity number: 1076335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.35k £3.20k £4.78k £5.61k £3.02k
Total expenditure £3.49k £3.96k £3.87k £3.19k £2.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A