NEWTON ABBOT CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1068560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.13k £235 £155 £200 £2.12k
Total expenditure £492 £897 £165 £165 £15
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A