Accounts and annual returns THE HAZEL STEVEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1069568
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 04 October 2010 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 21 August 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 16 October 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 02 January 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 02 January 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 16 January 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 17 January 2007 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window