Financial history ST MICHAELS BETWS-Y-COED TRUST

Charity number: 1081038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.11k £3.10k £2.01k £2.52k £4.50k
Total expenditure £2.52k £2.53k £2.23k £2.04k £4.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A