Accounts and annual returns PROCEEDS OF SALE OF THE FORMER EBENEZER INDEPENDENT CHAPEL

Charity number: 1086106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 October 2023 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2023 707 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2023 1072 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1726 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1726 days