Financial history GOVILON VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1069733
Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £16.13k £20.32k £21.95k £11.89k £16.39k
Total expenditure £12.21k £12.41k £10.89k £13.36k £17.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A