Governing document SHREE JAIN SANGH EAST LONDON AND ESSEX
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 19TH JANUARY 1992, AS AMENDED ON 9TH SEPTEMBER 1998. AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2016 as amended on 08 May 2022 as amended on 14 May 2023 as amended on 14 May 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JAIN RELIGION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP AND STUDY 2. TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE VEGETARIANISM 3. TO ADVANCE ANIMAL WELFARE INCLUDING ANY PURPOSE DIRECTED TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OR SUPPRESSION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS OR THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SUFFERING BY ANIMALS 4. TO EDUCATE THE CHILDREN OF MEMBERS IN THE JAIN RELIGION 5. TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.