Financial history 1ST HORSFORD AND ST FAITHS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1069845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £17.62k £15.85k £14.47k £28.37k £23.10k
Total expenditure £10.17k £11.87k £8.78k £4.71k £8.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.41k £10.67k