FARSOPHONE ASSOCIATION IN BRITAIN

Charity number: 1070348
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £75.37k £124.61k £107.95k £140.32k £119.46k
Total expenditure £69.71k £114.31k £126.09k £107.07k £116.46k
Income from government contracts £32.77k £83.30k £0 N/A £94.80k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A