Trustees THE FRIENDS OF TRURO CATHEDRAL
Charity number: 1072511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Hare | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Lingham | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Hare | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Lady Deidre Neale | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Miller | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MARY PRIOR | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Marilyn Trevelyan | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Neil Welton | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
DAPHNE JANET HILDEBRAND SKINNARD | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rev Alan Bashforth | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
Adam Starr | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.