Governing document TRANSAID WORLDWIDE SERVICES LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 MARCH 1998, 11 AUGUST 1998 AND 5 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY THE PROVISION OF EFFICIENT, EFFECTIVE AND SAFE TRANSPORT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.