Governing document TYDDYN MON
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL RELIEF OF ALL PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CARE, HOUSING, TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AND EMPLOYMENT FOR PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION AS TO RACE, AGE, SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF YNYS MON COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.