Accounts and annual returns NORTH MILLERS DALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1070832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 February 2024 385 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 February 2024 750 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 February 2024 1115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1636 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1636 days