Financial history HERNE BAY PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1069542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.70k £401 £1.81k £1.96k £2.63k
Total expenditure £1.15k £693 £1.82k £1.59k £950
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A